United States of America v. Hrasky et al

Defendant: Tim A. Hrasky, Community Development Coalition, Inc., Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka, Unknown Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Trustees, Legatees, Creditors and Assignees of such of the defendants as may be deceased, Unknown Spouses of the Defendants, Unknown Stockholders, Officers, Successors, Trustees, Creditors and Assignees of such Defendants as are existing, dissolved or dormant corporations, Unknown Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors, Successors and Assignees of such Defendants as are or were partners or in partnership, Unknown Guardians, Conservators and Trustees of such of the Defendants as are minors or are in any way under legal disability and Unknown Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Legatees, Trustees, Creditors and Assignees of any Person alleged to be deceased and made Defendants as such
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 8:2009cv00134
Filed: April 16, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: Scotts Bluff
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: David L. Piester
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 28:1345 Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE in the amount of $42,967.83, plus accrued interest in the amount of $7,000.50, together with interest accruing at the rate of $7.9461 from August 7, 2009, until the date of entry of this decree. Interest will accrue on said sums from and after the date of entry of this decree at the legal rate of 0.42 % computed daily and compounded annually until paid in full; setting priority of liens and directing sale of premises; granting Plaintiff USA's motion for default judgment filing 15 . Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)(Copy to be sent to Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka at the address provided by the USA).
February 12, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding MOTION to Confirm Sale 22 . Any person wishing to object to confirmation of the Marshal's sale conducted herein shall, not later than March 5, 2010, file with the Clerk and serve upon the parties to this action a written objection to confirmation of sale setting forth the basis for said objection. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed)(JAB)
March 15, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Order to Confirm Sale; sale confirmed; U.S. Marshal to deliver deed: Clerk to make disbursements as set out in the Judgment and Decree 17 . Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (1 Certified copy to USM)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Hrasky et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim A. Hrasky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Development Coalition, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Trustees, Legatees, Creditors and Assignees of such of the defendants as may be deceased
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouses of the Defendants
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Stockholders, Officers, Successors, Trustees, Creditors and Assignees of such Defendants as are existing, dissolved or dormant corporations
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Trustees, Creditors, Successors and Assignees of such Defendants as are or were partners or in partnership
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Guardians, Conservators and Trustees of such of the Defendants as are minors or are in any way under legal disability
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Legatees, Trustees, Creditors and Assignees of any Person alleged to be deceased and made Defendants as such
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Office of General Counsel USDA - Rural Development
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]