St. Joseph Terrace Apartments, LLC

Plaintiff: St. Joseph Terrace Apartments, LLC
 
Case Number: 8:2009cv00176
Filed: May 26, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Referring Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to Compel. The motion is is denied, without prejudice to reassertion on or before January 11, 2010 with all of the information required by NECivR 7.0.1. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
November 5, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
November 19, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER IN LIMINE- Plaintiff is precluded, in limine, from mentioning, making reference to, eliciting testimony regarding, or offering evidence of: (a) Plaintiffs damages that have not been previously disclosed to Defendant during discovery; (b) Specul ative damages which the Plaintiff is not reasonably certain to incur; (c) The financial status of any party in this action; and (d) Any expert opinion that is outside the scope of the experts written opinion produced during discovery; and The Motion in Limine 59 is otherwise denied, without prejudice to the Defendant asserting objections at the time of trial. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
December 1, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - On or before January 4, 2011, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, at smithcamp@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order t hat will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, then the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Any pending motions and stipulations are denied as moot. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice in accordance with NECivR 41.1. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: St. Joseph Terrace Apartments, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Joseph Terrace Apartments, LLC
Represented By: Adam R. White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]