Lau v. Aldi, Inc. (Kansas)

Plaintiff: Bradley A. Lau
Defendant: Aldi, Inc. (Kansas)
 
Case Number: 8:2009cv00219
Filed: July 2, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Referring Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Extend Deadlines. The Initial Progression Order 15 is modified as requested. Plaintiff's motion for certification of this case as a collective action shall be filed not later than 2/10/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
February 12, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's motion 25 be granted, that the Orders of December 2009 and December 11, 2009 (Filings 22 and 24 ) be vacated, and that this action be transferred to the Northern District of Ohio pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
February 17, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM, ORDER AND JUDGMENT - The Findings and Recommendation 29 are adopted in their entirety. The Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate and Transfer Venue 25 is granted. The Court's Orders of December 7, 2009 22 and December 11, 2009 [2 4] are vacated. The case shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. The Clerk of the Court shall take every action needed to accomplish the transfer and to terminate this case for statistical purposes. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lau v. Aldi, Inc. (Kansas)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley A. Lau
Represented By: Justin D. Eichmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldi, Inc. (Kansas)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]