Miles v. Unum Group

Plaintiff: Julie Miles
Defendant: Unum Group
 
Case Number: 8:2009cv00289
Filed: August 24, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Cheyenne
Referring Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2009 17 Featured Case ORDER. The court will delay entering an initial progression order, to facilitate immediate negotiations or mediation. Defense counsel shall file a status report no later than 11/20/2009, regarding the progress of settlement discussions. Plaintiff's unopposed request for trial in North Platte 8 is granted, and the Clerk shall amend the records of the court to reflect the change of venue. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
November 24, 2009 19 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that MOTION to Remand 7 be denied. Any objections to this recommendation must be filed within 14 days of today's date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
December 17, 2009 20 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting 19 Findings and Recommendation ; denying 7 Motion to Remand. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB, )
February 16, 2010 29 Featured Case ORDER that on or before March 17, 2010, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, at smithcamp@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case; absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice; and the Rule 16 planning conference set for March 29, 2010, is cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CJP)
March 16, 2010 31 Featured Case ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT that Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal 30 is granted;Plaintiff Julie Miles' claims against Defendant Unum Group, f/k/a UnumProvident Corporation, f/k/a Provident Companies, Inc., a/k/a Unum LifeInsurance Company of America are dismissed with prejudice and the action is dismissed at Plaintiff's cost. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (CJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Miles v. Unum Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Miles
Represented By: Robert M. Brenner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]