v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $221,115.00 in United States currency
 
Case Number: 8:2009cv00357
Filed: October 6, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Adams
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Richard G. Kopf (REFERRAL JUDGE)
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2009 10 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On or before December 21, 2009, Craig Cascarano shall register for admittance to practice in this court, and for the courts CM/ECF System, or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the court. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)(Copy to Attorney via US Mail)
August 17, 2010 19 Featured Case SETTLEMENT ORDER. The court has been advised that the parties in the above-captioned matter have reached a settlement of their claims. Accordingly,IT IS ORDERED that:(1)Within thirty (30) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall f ile a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court (and provide a copy to the magistrate judge and to United States District Judge Richard G. Kopf, the trial judge to whom this case is assigned), toge ther with submitting to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case;(2)Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice;(3)This case is removed from the court's September 7, 2010 trial docket upon representation by the parties that the case has settled.***Set Dismissal Papers Deadline -- due by 9/17/2010. Termed 9/7/2010 trial date.Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
October 20, 2010 22 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER approving 20 the parties' Stipulation. One Thousand One Hundred Fifteen Dollars ($1,115.00) of Defendant property shall be returned to Claimant, Victor Sison, by delivering said property to the trust account of Claima nts attorney of record, Craig Cascarano. The Marshal shall deliver said amount by making payment to Craig Cascaranos trust account; Upon Mr. Cascaranos receipt of the $1,115.00, he shall file a receipt for said amount with the court. Upon the fi ling of said receipt, the court shall enter judgment in this action; The balance of Defendant property, $220,000.00, is hereby forfeited to the United States. All right, title or interest in or to Defendant propertyheld by any person or entity is hereby forever barred and foreclosed; The Marshal shall dispose of said $220,000.00 in accordance with law. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (1 Certified copy to USM)(MKR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: v. United States of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $221,115.00 in United States currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]