United States of America v. $103,000.00 in United States Currency

Case Number: 8:2009cv00454
Filed: December 16, 2009
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Drug Related Seizure of Property Office
Referring Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and to continue trial. Trial remains set for Tuesday, October 12, 2010 before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. A party may object to this order by filing an "Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order" no later than Thursday, October 7, 2010. The objecting party must comply with all requirements of NECivR 72.2. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
October 4, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (Civil Non-Jury Trial). Trial set for Wednesday, October 13, 2010, at 09:00 a.m., Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
October 6, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 1. The objections to the Magistrate Judge's order 25 are granted insofar as counsel is granted leave to withdraw as stated in Paragraph 3 below; 2. Trial is not continued; and 3. Counsel for the Claimant Tri Q. On is given leave to file a notice of withdrawal stating that he has personally or telephonically notified the Claimant of this order and given the Clerk of the Court of the Claimant's current mailing address. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
October 8, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The notice of withdrawal filed by attorney Frank E. Robak, Sr. 28 is granted. The government's motion to continue trial and set a status hearing 27 is granted. The status hearing is scheduled for Wednesday, October 13, 2010, at 9:00 a.m., and trial will be rescheduled after discussion at the status hearing. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to the Claimant, Tri Q. On, at the address given in Filing No. 28 . Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed as directed)(JAE)
October 28, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Claimant's Motion to Appoint Counsel 31 and Motion for Subpoena Duces Tcum 32 . Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
November 19, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - The Defendant property shall be forfeited to the United States. A separate Judgment will be entered. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of these Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to the Claimant, Tri Q. On, at his last known address. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed as directed)(JAE)
February 24, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Withdraw Exhibits or to Show Cause Why Exhibits Should Not be Destroyed. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MLF, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $103,000.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]