United States of America v. 2002 BMW 745i, VIN WBAGL63422DP51620

Case Number: 8:2010cv00015
Filed: January 13, 2010
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1341 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for final disposition. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (KBJ)
July 9, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 18 Motion to Continue. The trial of this case, previously scheduled for July 14, 2010, is cancelled. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/3/2010 at 01:30 PM to discuss when the necessary transcripts may be available and the evidence and briefing schedule for submitting this case on the Hall County District Court record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB, )
August 16, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This case will be determined on documentary evidence, and no trial testimony before this court is needed or will be elicited. On or before August 30, 2010: The government shall file, as an index of evidence, the transcript of the parallel court proceeding held in Hall County, Nebraska District Court on April 15, 2010 before Judge Wright. The defendant shall submit a copy of the relevant traffic stop video to the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge. The court wi ll assure the video is properly submitted and filed as evidence herein. The parties shall file any joint stipulation reached, if any, on the outstanding lienholder issue. On or before September 7, 2010, the defendant shall file its brief, and the governments responsive brief shall be filed on or before September 21, 2010.No reply brief shall be filed absent leave of the court for good cause shown. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KBJ)
November 5, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The claims of Benjamin Kasper and Mike Joyce 11 against the defendant BMW are denied and dismissed. Judgment will be entered in accordance with this memorandum and order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KBJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 2002 BMW 745i, VIN WBAGL63422DP51620
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]