United States of America v. $22,000.00 in United States Currency

 
Case Number: 8:2010cv00034
Filed: January 26, 2010
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Magistrate Judges Findings and Recommendation (Filing No. 29 ) are adopted in their entirety; and granting in part and denying in part 16 the Defendant's Motion to Suppress in accordance with the Findings and Recommendation. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
August 3, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Claimant, Jerry Cato, II, is deemed to be proceeding pro se. The parties shall prepare a proposed final pretrial conference order to be submitted to the undersigned magistrate judge by 8/25/2010. Th e Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/27/2010 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. Trial (nonjury) remains scheduled for 9/28/2010 at 8:30 a.m. before the Honorable Laurie Smith Camp, United States District Judge. The Clerk shall a mend the records of the court to show that Jerry Cato, II, is proceeding without the assistance of counsel and shall mail a copy of this order to Mr. Cato at his last known address. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (Copies mailed as directed) (JSF)
September 1, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL ORDER. Non-Jury Trial set for 11/9/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2010 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. Draft of final pretrial order due 10/8/2010 to Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
November 1, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
November 16, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - The Defendant property shall be forfeited to the United States. A separate Judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAE)
December 23, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - The Defendant property shall be forfeited to the United States. A separate Judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAE)
December 23, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion to Amend the Court's Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. An Amended Findings of Fact and Conclusions will be filed, changing the word alert to indication on page 8, line 3. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. $22,000.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]