Gentile v. Sun Products et al

Plaintiff: Robert Gentile
Defendant: John M. Gill, Sun Hockey and Sun Products
Garnishee: Sergeant's Pet Care Products, Inc.
 
Case Number: 8:2010cv00204
Filed: May 25, 2010
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2010 12 Featured Case ORDER that all nonexempt earnings, property, credits, or money withheld by the garnishee up to the amount of $2,385,991.67 be transferred to the Court for payment and forwarding to the judgment creditor who is entitled to the same. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy to barnishee and fin. adm.)(JAE)
July 20, 2010 18 Featured Case ORDER that the garnishment shall be a continuing lien against the nonexempt earnings of the judgment debtor. The garnishee shall continue to withhold the nonexempt earnings, property, credits, or money of the judgment debtor for as long as payments a re due from the garnishee to judgment debtor up to the amount of $2,385,991.67. The withheld earnings, property, credits, or money shall be transferred to the Court as they become due for payment and forwarding to the judgment creditor who is entitled to the same. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order to Sergeant's Pet Care Products, Inc., at 2625 South 158th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, 68130. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copies mailed as directed) (JSF)
August 16, 2010 19 Featured Case ORDER that the clerk of court shall pay the funds on deposit, i.e., $13,789.41 and $10,890.24 to Robert Gentile, with the check to be mailed to: Thomas P. OConnell, 1026A Massachusetts Avenue, Arlington, Massachusetts 02476.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (copy to Fin. Adm.) (JAE)
January 6, 2011 20 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the clerk of court shall pay the funds on deposit, i.e., $12,503.43 to Robert Gentile, with the check to be mailed to: Thomas P. O'Connell 1026A Massachusetts Avenue, Arlington, Massachusetts 02476. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy to Financial)(TCL )
March 1, 2011 30 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION on Western Bank's Amended Motion for Leave to file Complaint in Intervention 25 . Western Bank provides little if any basis as to why the Court should grant intervention at this late stage, and no reason is given for its delay in filing this motion to intervene. For these reasons, the Court will deny the motion. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed) (MKR)
April 6, 2011 33 Featured Case ORDER- The Clerkof the court shall pay the funds on deposit, i.e., $ 8,308.01 to Robert Gentile, with the check to be mailed to: Thomas P. OConnell, 1026A Massachusetts Avenue, Arlington, Massachusetts 02476. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy to Financial)(MKR)
July 8, 2011 35 Featured Case ORDER regarding 34 the Motion for Release of Funds. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk of court shall pay the funds on deposit, i.e., $10,023.44 to Robert Gentile, with the check to be mailed to: Thomas P. O'Connell, 1026A Massachusetts Avenue, Arlington, MA 02476. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy to financial)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gentile v. Sun Products et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gentile
Represented By: Thomas P. O'Connell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Gill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Hockey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Products
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Sergeant's Pet Care Products, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly N. Pleas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]