Peetz v. Genentech, Inc. et al

Defendant: Biogen Idec, Inc., DOES 1-25 and Genentech, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jesse Peetz
 
Case Number: 8:2010cv00297
Filed: August 10, 2010
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 112 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 101 Defendant's Motion to Quash And/Or Motion for a Protective Order. Genentech shall produce representatives in accordance with the contested Rule 30(b)(6) Notices of Depositions. However, each of the three contested Rule 30(b)(6) topics at issue in Genentech's motion is limited in scope to the use of Rituxan to treat TTP. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
September 5, 2013 116 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Plaintiff's Statement of Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order (filing 113 ) is sustained. The Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Order (filing 112 ) is modified such that each of the three contested Rule 30(b)(6) topics at issue in Genentech's motion for protective order is limited in scope to the use of Rituxan to treat TTP or the safety or risks of using Rituxan, including the failure to warn of any such risks. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (AOA)
September 6, 2013 118 Featured Case ORDER granting 117 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Motion to Withdraw the appearance of Skye L. Perryman is hereby granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
December 5, 2013 122 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -1) The parties' motion, (Filing No. 121 ), is granted. 2) The deadlines for filing a motion to compel, and for completing written and deposition discovery, are extended pending further order of the court.3) A t elephonic conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on February 4, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. to discuss the status of the parties' settlement efforts and any necessary case progression re-scheduling. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
April 2, 2014 133 Featured Case ORDER - The motion to withdraw filed on behalf of Marina Eisner as counsel of record for the defendants, (filing no. 132 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA)
April 7, 2014 137 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendants' motion to reschedule, (Filing No. 135 ), is granted. Within ten (10) days after the mediation, the parties shall contact the undersigned magistrate judge's chambers to re-schedule the conference call. The plaintiff's objection, (Filing No. 136 ), is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA)
July 14, 2014 152 Featured Case ORDER granting 150 Motion to Extend and 151 Motion to Substitute Party. Forrest F. Peetz, as Personal Representative for the Estate of Jesse Robert Peetz, Deceased, is hereby substituted as the plaintiff in this case. On or before July 21, 2014 the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal, or other dispositive stipulation, together with submitting to the undersigned judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KMG)
July 15, 2014 158 Featured Case ORDER granting 153 Motion to Extend Dismissal Papers Deadline. Overruling 156 Objection by Plaintiff. On or before August 13, 2014 the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal or other dispositive stipulation, together with submitting to the undersigned judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KMG)
December 5, 2011 50 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER adopting 49 Stipulation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
February 14, 2012 54 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 53 Stipulation for An Extension of Time. That the defendants, Genetech, Inc., and Biogen Idec, Inc. have until March 14, 2012 to respond and/or object to discovery requests of the Plaintiff, JessePeetz. That all other deadlines and provisions of the Court's Order of Initial Progression (filing 34 ) shall remain in effect. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
October 25, 2012 79 Featured Case ORDER granting 78 Motion to Continue. Status Conference set for 1/29/2013 at 01:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
May 2, 2013 98 Featured Case ORDER - During today's conference call, the parties identified an ongoing disputed discovery issue. They have agreed upon a briefing schedule for submitting that issue for court resolution. 1) Genentech's anticipated motion to quash wit h supporting brief and evidence shall be filed on or before May 20, 2013.2) Plaintiff's response shall be filed by June 10, 2013.3) Any reply shall be filed on or before June 17, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Peetz v. Genentech, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biogen Idec, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-25
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genentech, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Peetz
Represented By: Maren L. Chaloupka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]