In re James Widtfeldt et al

Debtor: Gary M. Burival, Joyce Burival, Phillip Burival and Richard Burival
Creditor: Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Trustee: Rick D. Lange and U.S. Trustee
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
402) 925-2564 (fax: James Widtfeldt
 
Case Number: 8:2010cv00298
Filed: August 11, 2010
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2011 12 Featured Case ORDER that the clerk's office modify the docket to reflect the correct filing date of the notice of appeal 11 . Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(DKM, )
December 16, 2011 16 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendant's appeal, Filing No. 15 is granted. Defendant's appeal is deemed filed on July 12, 2011. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
January 27, 2011 5 Featured Case ORDER - Appellant shall submit and serve a copy of his brief within twenty (20) days from date of this order. Appellee shall submit and serve his brief within twenty (20) days after receipt of the brief of the appellant. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
June 8, 2011 9 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court finds that the order of the bankruptcy court should be affirmed. The trustee is entitled to judgment as a matter of law on the validity of Mr. Widtfeldt's purportedsecurity interests. Accordingly, The judgment of the bankruptcy court is affirmed. This appeal is dismissed. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party) (KBJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: In re James Widtfeldt et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Gary M. Burival
Represented By: William L. Needler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Joyce Burival
Represented By: William L. Needler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Phillip Burival
Represented By: William L. Needler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Richard Burival
Represented By: William L. Needler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: John M. Guthery, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Rick D. Lange
Represented By: Brian S. Kruse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Patricia M. Fahey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk - Lincoln
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
402) 925-2564 (fax: James Widtfeldt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]