Jacobs et al v. PT Holdings, et al.

Plaintiff: Harold Dean Marshall, LaRue Kay Marshall, JMJ Land, LLC, Carolyn Sue Jacobs and Duane Jacobs
Defendant: George McFadden, PT Holdings, Lawrence J. Volf, Larry A. Baker and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
 
Case Number: 8:2011cv00106
Filed: March 25, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2011 20 Featured Case ORDER granting in part the Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. The Clerk of Court shall strike Plaintiffs Evidence Index (filing 18) from the record and filing 18 shall be placed under seal. By or before June 10, 2011, Plaintiffs shall file an amended evidence index and attach properly redacted evidence. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
June 17, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER regarding the 25 Suggestion of Bankruptcy. Pursuant to NEGenR 1.5(a) (1) and 28 U.S.C. § 157, this case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. This case and any pending motions shall be terminate d for statistical purposes by the Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska. The Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska shall deliver the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
August 22, 2011 28 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting 27 Report and Recommendation that this adversary proceeding be withdrawn to the U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska. The Order of Reference 26 to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska is withdrawn. This case shall be progressed by U.S. Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
November 28, 2011 41 Featured Case ORDER - The Report and Recommendation of U.S. Bankruptcy Court Chief Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Filing No. 40 ) is adopted; The reference of Case No. A11-4184-TLS to the Bankruptcy Court shall be withdrawn; and Case No. A11-4184-TLS shall be consolidated with Case No. 8:11CV106, and shall progress in this Court. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TEL)
December 30, 2011 47 Featured Case ORDER- Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (filing 33 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this order to the pro se parties in this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se parties as directed) (MKR)
February 13, 2012 62 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Objection to Claim (Case No. BK11-40267-TLS, Filing No. 43 ) is denied. The Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Case No. A11-4184-TLS, Filing No. 11 ) is granted in part, and denied in part, as follows: (a) "Clai m" three, titled "Fraudulent Transfer" in the Adversary Complaint (Case No. A11-4184, Filing No. 1 ), is dismissed. (b) "Claim" four, titled "Equitable Subordination" in the Adversary Complaint (Case No. A11-4184, Filing No. 1 ), is dismissed. (c) The Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Case No. A11-4184- TLS, Filing No. 11 ) is otherwise denied. The Motion to Amend Memorandum and Order (Filing No. 48 ) is denied as moot. The Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation shall have until February 27, 2012, to file a responsive pleading to the Adversary Complaint (Case No. A11-4184-TLS, Filing No. 1 ) filed by JMJ Land, LLC. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)
March 12, 2012 67 Featured Case ORDER -The Defendants are directed to file a Supplementary Statement of Jurisdiction, on or before March 22, 2012, demonstrating the basis of this Courts jurisdiction and why the action that was removed from the District Court of Sherman County, Nebraska, should not be remanded to state court. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (copy mailed) (MKR)
March 27, 2012 68 Featured Case ORDER - The action that was removed from the District Court of Sherman County, Nebraska (Filing Nos. 1 , 1-1), is remanded to the District Court of Sherman County, Nebraska; and The adversary proceeding (Case No. AP11-4184-TLS) that was consolidated with Case No. 8:11CV106 (Filing No. 41) remains pending before this Court. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed) (MKR)
April 23, 2012 73 Featured Case ORDER that the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation has a statutory exemption from federal court filing fees. Therefore, the $350.00 filing fee shall be refunded to the law firm initiating this lawsuit on behalf of the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JLS, )
October 22, 2012 87 Featured Case ORDER AND JUDGMENT approving the 86 Stipulation for Dismissalw ith prejudice. The above-captioned action, which includes the adversary proceeding that was consolidated with the above captioned action (see Case No. AP11-4184-TLS), is dismissed as to all claims and counterclaims; and 3. Each party shall bear its own costs, complete record waived. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (copies mailed) (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jacobs et al v. PT Holdings, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Dean Marshall
Represented By: Brian J. Koenig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaRue Kay Marshall
Represented By: Brian J. Koenig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JMJ Land, LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Koenig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Sue Jacobs
Represented By: Brian J. Koenig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Jacobs
Represented By: Brian J. Koenig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George McFadden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PT Holdings
Represented By: Bruce A. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence J. Volf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry A. Baker
Represented By: Bruce A. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Michael T. Eversden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]