Badami v. AFY et al

Plaintiff: Joseph H. Badami
Defendant: Sears Cattle Co.
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Debtor: AFY
 
Case Number: 8:2011cv00288
Filed: August 18, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2012 11 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Chief Bankruptcy Judge Saladino's proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law dated July 6, 2011, are adopted; Chief Bankruptcy Judge Saladino's Order, Report and Recommendation dated August 18, 2011, (ECF No. 1), remains adopted; and Judgment shall be entered in favor of the plaintiff in the amount of $291,937.00. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (ADB)
November 2, 2011 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Oral Motion. The oral motion for extension of time for counsel for the defendant Sears Cattle Co. to inform Magistrate Judge Zwart of his thoughts of the procedure that should be followed in the resolution of the remaining issue or issues, ECF No. 3 , is granted; and the defendant, Sears Cattle Co., shall have on or before November 15, 2011, in which to comply.Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
January 17, 2012 7 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Order on Findings and Recommendation 2 . Sears Cattle asks that this case be stayed pending the Eighth Circuit's determination on the appeal from judgments entered in In Re: AFY, Inc., 8:10-cv-00214. Sears Cattle has provided only a conclusory allegation that the Eighth Circuit's ruling on the matters before Judge Kopf may give rise to issue or claim preclusion on Sears Cattle's claims for setoff. But it is unclear why or how the ultimate outcome of the case before Judge Kopf could impact this case. The court will request briefing on this issue. Accordingly, Any motion to stay must be filed in accordance with NECivR 7.0.1(a) by January 31, 2012. Responses or replies to such motions shall be fil ed in accordance with NECivR 7.0.1(b) and (c). In the absence of a timely motion to stay, the district court will deem this case fully submitted for de novo review of the bankruptcy courts proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Badami v. AFY et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph H. Badami
Represented By: Erin L. Ebeler
Represented By: Joseph H. Badami
Represented By: James A. Overcash
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Cattle Co.
Represented By: Jerrold L. Strasheim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk - Omaha
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: AFY
Represented By: Jerrold L. Strasheim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]