Garden v. Central Nebraska Housing Corp. et al

Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Defendant: Unverzagt Feed Lot, Rick Roberts, Security First Bank, Loretta Sue Roberts, Pinnacle Bank, Pinnacle Bank of Newcastle Wyoming, Central Nebraska Housing Corp. and Coljo Investments, LLC
402) 475-1966 (fax: John Zapata
Plaintiff: Richard P. Garden, Jr.
 
Case Number: 8:2011cv00292
Filed: August 24, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2011 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant Central Nebraska Housing Corp.'s cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Filing No. 12 ) is denied. Defendants Rick Roberts and Loretta Sue Robertss cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Filing No. 13 ) is granted. The "Objections" (Filing Nos. 16 , 20 , 25 ) are terminated. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)
August 24, 2011 2 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court directs the clerk's office to docket Bankruptcy Proceedings No. 10-40159-TLS, Adversary Proceedings No. 10-04097-TLS, as a new civil case. In addition, the court directs the clerk's office to directly assign the undersigned judge to the new civil case, as the matter is at least arguably related to the above-captioned case. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TEL)
October 13, 2011 37 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 4 ) is granted in part, and denied in part, as follows: a. Plaintiff Richard P. Garden, Jr. is ordered to deposit with the Clerk of the Court the $166,500 in disput ed funds; b. The following documents will be reformed to reflect that the subject property is located in Range 46 of the 6th P.M., and not Range 48: c. Title in the subject property is quieted in Defendant Coljo Investments, LLC; d. Costs and attorney's fees will not be awarded out of the funds paid into the Clerk of Court. The "Objections" (Filing Nos. 35 , 36 ) are terminated. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy to Finance Department)(AOA)
December 20, 2011 50 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant Central Nebraska Housing Corp.'s Motion to Amend Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Filing No. 40 ), is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
February 9, 2012 60 Featured Case ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
March 30, 2012 84 Featured Case ORDER the Joint Motion to Extend Time 83 is granted as follows: a) Defendants Rick and Loretta Sue Roberts shall file an amended motion for sanctions on or before 4/6/12; b) defendants Central Nebraska Housing Corp. and John Zapata shall file thei r brief in response to the amended motion for sanctions on or before 4/23/12; c) Defendants Rich and Loretta Sue Roberts shall file their reply brief in support of their amended motion for sanctions on or before 4/30/12; and 2) Pursuant to the partie s Stipulation 62 and the Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law 82 the Clerk of Court is directed to release the deposited funds as follows: a) $47,732.30 to defendant Pinnacle Bank, and sent it to Pinnalce Bank's counsel at the addres s listed in this order. b) $2,507.08 to Plaintiff Richard P. Garden, Jr. and sent it to the address listed in this order. What remains of the $166,500.00 deposited with the Clerk of Court shall be retained by the Clerk of Court until further order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (E-mailed to finance)(DKM, )
April 26, 2012 94 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion to Stay or Motion for Supersedeas Bond and Motion to Extend Time for Filing Notice of Appeal (Filing No. 93 ) filed by Defendant Central Nebraska Housing Corp. is denied, without prejudice. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Garden v. Central Nebraska Housing Corp. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk - Lincoln
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unverzagt Feed Lot
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Roberts
Represented By: Joe M. Hawbaker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security First Bank
Represented By: David W. Pederson
Represented By: Laura E. Troshynski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Sue Roberts
Represented By: Joe M. Hawbaker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Bank of Newcastle Wyoming
Represented By: James M. Carney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Nebraska Housing Corp.
Represented By: Michael J. Whaley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coljo Investments, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Whaley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
402) 475-1966 (fax: John Zapata
Represented By: Michael J. Whaley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard P. Garden, Jr.
Represented By: Terry R. Wittler
Represented By: Richard P. Garden, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]