UMB Bank, N.A. v. Dempster Industries LLC et al

Defendant: Felicia Davis, Wallace Davis and Dempster Industries LLC
Plaintiff: UMB Bank, N.A.
 
Case Number: 8:2011cv00358
Filed: October 17, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Continue. Planning Conference is continued to 7/13/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
April 18, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER upon notice of settlement the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal on or before May 20, 2013. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The previously scheduled pretrial conference and trial are cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
May 17, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE approving 34 Stipulation for Dismissal. All claims asserted herein by either the Plaintiff or by the Defendants are hereby dismissed without prejudice. IT IF FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall bear its, his, or her own costs and attorneys' fees herein. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: UMB Bank, N.A. v. Dempster Industries LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dempster Industries LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMB Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]