Valmont Industries, Inc. v. Lindsay Corporation et al

Counter Claimant: Lindsay Corporation
Defendant: Lindsay Corporation
Counter Defendant: Valmont Industries, Inc., Farmscan AG Pty Ltd. and Board of Regents of the University of Idaho
Plaintiff: Valmont Industries, Inc., Farmscan AG Pty Ltd. and Board of Regents of the University of Idaho
Case Number: 8:2011cv00415
Filed: December 8, 2011
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Gregory P. Love and the law firm of Stevens Love Hill & Hold, PLLC, is deemed withdrwn as counsel for Lindsay Corporation. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
January 24, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 44 Motion for Leave to file second amended complaint. Plaintiff's shall have until January 31, 2012, to file their second amended complaint. Defendant shall have rule time to respond. Amended Complaint due by 1/31/2012. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (copy mailed) (MKR)
February 3, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2012 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
May 1, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER - Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(c), the parties agree to the entry of this Protective Order (this "Order") to facilitate and expedite discovery in this action. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
May 14, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 62 Joint Stipulation of the parties. The parties shall exchange a list of claim terms, phrases or clauses that the party contends should be construed by the Court, and must identify any claim element that the party contends sho uld be governed by the sixth paragraph of 35 U.S.C. § 112, to be interpreted on or before May 21, 2012. The parties shall exchange proposed construction of each claim term, phrase, or clause which the parties have collectively identified for claim construction purposes and identify intrinsic evidence, as set forth in Patent Rule 4-2 on or before June 18, 2012. The parties shall complete and file a joint claim construction and prehearing statement on or before July 9, 2012. All other dates in the Courts scheduling order (Filing No. 53 ) remain unchanged. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR, )
September 6, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting the 68 Stipulation for Dismissal. All causes of action filed herein by and betweenplaintiffs Valmont Industries, Inc., Farmscan AG PTY LTD and Board of Regents of the University of Idaho, and defendant Lindsay Corporation, are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay its own costs and attorneys fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valmont Industries, Inc. v. Lindsay Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Lindsay Corporation
Represented By: John P. Passarelli
Represented By: Stephen J. Pedersen
Represented By: Gregory P. Love
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Corporation
Represented By: John P. Passarelli
Represented By: Stephen J. Pedersen
Represented By: Gregory P. Love
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Valmont Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Jane J. Du
Represented By: Mark F. Enenbach
Represented By: Neil J. McNabnay
Represented By: P. Weston Musselman, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Farmscan AG Pty Ltd.
Represented By: Jane J. Du
Represented By: Mark F. Enenbach
Represented By: Neil J. McNabnay
Represented By: P. Weston Musselman, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Idaho
Represented By: P. Weston Musselman, Jr.
Represented By: Neil J. McNabnay
Represented By: Mark F. Enenbach
Represented By: Jane J. Du
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valmont Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr.
Represented By: David B. Conrad
Represented By: Jane J. Du
Represented By: Mark F. Enenbach
Represented By: Neil J. McNabnay
Represented By: P. Weston Musselman, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmscan AG Pty Ltd.
Represented By: Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr.
Represented By: Jane J. Du
Represented By: Mark F. Enenbach
Represented By: Neil J. McNabnay
Represented By: P. Weston Musselman, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Regents of the University of Idaho
Represented By: Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr.
Represented By: Jane J. Du
Represented By: Mark F. Enenbach
Represented By: Neil J. McNabnay
Represented By: P. Weston Musselman, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]