Bridger v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: James Bridger
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 8:2011cv00423
Filed: December 12, 2011
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court GENERAL ORDER No. 2011-14 regarding the Assignment of Cases Involving Bershire Hathaway or its Subsidiaries as Parties. This order shall take effect immediately and rescinds General Order 2010-07, General Order 2010-04, and General Order 2007-19. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
October 15, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Oral Motion Jury Trial set for 6/3/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2013 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Telephone Conference set for 1/22/2013 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
December 13, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court GENERAL ORDER No. 2010-07 regarding the Assignment of Cases Involving Berkshire Hathaway or its Subsidiaries as Parties. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridger v. BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bridger
Represented By: E. Terry Sibbernsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Kenneth L. Weltz
Represented By: Thomas C. Sattler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]