Door v. Douglas County Corrections Strom

Plaintiff: Duop Door
Defendant: Douglas County Corrections Strom
 
Case Number: 8:2011cv00428
Filed: December 13, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2011 6 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Duop Door shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $3.79 by January 19, 2012, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiffs institution; Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 1/19/2012: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party and as directed)(MKR)
February 13, 2012 7 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff shall have until March 14, 2012, to amend his Complaint and clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Check for amended complaint on March 14, 2012, and dismiss if none filed. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
March 26, 2012 8 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Memorandum and Order 7 . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915, Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice because it fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Door v. Douglas County Corrections Strom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duop Door
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Corrections Strom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]