Yellow Horse et al v. Dawes County Jail et al

Defendant: Steve Crile, Karl J. Bailey and Dawes County Jail
Plaintiff: Darin little white man and Dale Yellow Horse
Case Number: 8:2012cv00016
Filed: January 10, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Dale Yellow Horse shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $.47 by 3/12/2012, unless an enlargement of time is granted in respon se to a written motion. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at th Plaintiff's institution. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 3/12/2012:initial partial filing feepayment due. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party and plaintiff's institution)(MKR)
February 10, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on the courts own motion. Plaintiff Darin Little White Man is directed to correct the above-listed technical defects in the Complaint on or before March 12, 2012. By this date, Plaintiff Darin Little White Man must sign the Comp laint, and either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice as to Plaintiff Darin Little White Man. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff Darin Little White Man the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadlin e in this matter with the following text: March 12, 2012 ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 3/12/2012: Check for MIFP or payment and signed Complaint). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party with AO240 form)(MKR)
March 2, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Darin little white man shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $8.00 by 4/2/2012, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiffs institution. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 4/2/2012:initial partial filing feepayment due. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed)(MKR)
March 27, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiff Dale Yellow Horses claims (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice because he failed to comply with this courts orders. The Clerk of the court is directed to terminate Plaintiff Dale Yellow Horse as a plaintiff in this matter. Party Dale Yellow Horse terminated. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
April 16, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff Darin little white man's Complaint (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice because he failed to comply with this court's orders. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yellow Horse et al v. Dawes County Jail et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Crile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl J. Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawes County Jail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin little white man
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Yellow Horse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]