Eastern Nebraska Human Services Agency v. United States of America

Defendant: United States of America
Plaintiff: Eastern Nebraska Human Services Agency
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00053
Filed: February 8, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The plaintiff shall show cause, by an appropriate filing on or before July 23, 2012, why this case should not be dismissed. The plaintiff's failure to file a timely response to this order will result in the case being dismissed without further notice. Should the plaintiff file a response, the defendant may file a reply in support of its motion to dismiss on or before August 6, 2012. (Show Cause Deadline set for 7/23/2012.) Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (TEL)
July 24, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The defendant's motion to dismiss (filing 20 ) is held in abeyance until further notice. The parties are directed to inform the Court every sixty days of the status of the case. (Initial Status Report due by 9/24/2012.) Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (TEL)
August 24, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - Upon the parties' joint stipulation for dismissal (filing 25 ), this matter is dismissed with prejudice, the parties to bear their respective costs, including any possible attorney fees or other expenses of litigation. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Eastern Nebraska Human Services Agency v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Martin M. Shoemaker
Represented By: Ellen K. Weis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eastern Nebraska Human Services Agency
Represented By: Christopher D. Jerram
Represented By: Jonathan L. Grob
Represented By: Patrick D. Pepper
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Pirruccello
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]