Segura v. Houston

Respondent: Robert Houston
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Petitioner: Eddy Segura
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00060
Filed: February 9, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION - The Court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this case. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
March 26, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
March 27, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)
March 27, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Petition (Filing No. 1 ), the Court preliminarily determines that Claims One, Two, and Three, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. By May 10, 2012, respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the Court. (Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 5/10/2012.) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Segura v. Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eddy Segura
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]