Cusatis, Jr. v. Leo Trucking, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Bradley Cusatis, Jr.
Defendant: Ajaib S Nanreh and Leo Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2012cv00072
Filed: February 21, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2013 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: On or before October 7, 2013, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett, at gossett@ned.uscourts.gov, a d raft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The pretrial conference set for September 19, 2013, and the jury trial set for October 8, 2013, are cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
April 20, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TEL)
January 7, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Estate of Brandon Taylor's Motion to Continue Trial (filing 61 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
January 11, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Estate of Brandon Taylor's Amended Motion to Continue Trial (filing 76 ) is granted. By or before January 25, 2013, the parties shall jointly submit a proposed amended progression schedule for this case. The pretrial conference scheduled for January 31, 2013, is cancelled and will be rescheduled at a later time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
January 15, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: On or before March 29, 2013, these parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to Chief District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, at smithcamp@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of their case. The claims between plaintiff Estate of Brandon L. Taylor and the defendants remain pending. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
January 28, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - IT IS ORDERED: Per the joint motion (# 80 ), the parties have voluntarily consented to have the United States Magistrate Judge conduct any and all further proceedings in this case, including the trial and ord er the entry of final judgment. The Final Pretrial Conference with the undersigned magistrate judge is set for September 16, 2013 at 10:30 A.M., in chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2210, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. A Jury trial is set to commence, on October 8, 2013 at 9:30 A.M., in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable F.A. Gossett III, United States Magistrate Judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cusatis, Jr. v. Leo Trucking, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Cusatis, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Klaus
Represented By: Andrew K. Carothers
Represented By: Mark R. Richardson
Represented By: Peter C. Wegman
Represented By: Michael E. Willet
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajaib S Nanreh
Represented By: Jerald L. Rauterkus
Represented By: Matthew B. Reilly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Jerald L. Rauterkus
Represented By: Matthew B. Reilly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]