General Drivers and Helpers Union, Local No. 554 v. Roberts Dairy Company, LLC

Defendant: Roberts Dairy Company, LLC
Plaintiff: General Drivers and Helpers Union, Local No. 554
Counter Claimant: Roberts Dairy Company, LLC
Counter Defendant: General Drivers and Helpers Union, Local No. 554
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00099
Filed: March 12, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2012 53 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses (filing 33 ) is denied as moot. Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Discovery Responses (filing 41 ) is granted, in part. By or before January 14, 2012, Defendant shall supplement its responses to Interrogatory Nos. 5 through 10 as set forth above. Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order (filing 47 ) is granted. The parties shall govern themselves in accordance with the provisions set forth in Defend ant's motion. A telephone conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on Friday, January 4, 2013, at 10:00 a.m., for the purpose of reviewing the preparation of the case to date and the scheduling of the case to trial. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call to the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
March 18, 2013 63 Featured Case ORDER that as a result of the agreement of the parties, Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 59 is denied as being moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
May 13, 2013 72 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions (filing 64 ) and Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Sanctions (filing 67 ) are denied. Defendant shall produce the documents referenced in its response to Interrogatory 15 as set forth above. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
March 12, 2014 90 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL - 1. Defendant's Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Filing No. 89 ) is approved, and Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (Filing No. 88 ) is granted; 2. The above-captioned matter is dismissed with prejudice; and 3. The parties will pay their own costs and attorney's fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: General Drivers and Helpers Union, Local No. 554 v. Roberts Dairy Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts Dairy Company, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Martone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Drivers and Helpers Union, Local No. 554
Represented By: Maynard H. Weinberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Roberts Dairy Company, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Martone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: General Drivers and Helpers Union, Local No. 554
Represented By: Maynard H. Weinberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]