United States of America v. $10,020.00 and $50,000.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $10,020.00 and $50,000.00 in United States Currency
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00121
Filed: April 4, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for final disposition. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
February 20, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Continue. Jury Trial set for 4/8/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2013 at 12:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
October 28, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The parties' stipulation for resolution of this case, (Filing No. 38 ), is approved. Twenty-five thousand dollars and no cents ($25,000.00) of the Defendant property shall be returned to the Cl aimant, Rodolfo A. DeLeon. The payment will be tendered to the trust account of the Claimant's attorney, David J. Tarrell. All right, title, or interest in the remaining Defendant property, (viz., $25,000.00), shall be forfeited to the United States, with all right, title, or interest in or to such property held by any person or entity forever barred and foreclosed. The Marshal shall dispose of the defendant property forfeited to United States in accordance with the law. Plaint iff and Claimant shall pay their own costs and attorney's fees associated with this lawsuit. Within seven (7) days after receipt of the tendered funds, Claimant's counsel shall file a notice indicating such receipt. Within seven (7) days after the receipt is filed, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (1 certified copy to USM) (TCL )
December 18, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT regarding 41 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal. Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant property and the Claimant Rodolfo A. DeLeon are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. $10,020.00 and $50,000.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,020.00 and $50,000.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]