Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Imagination Industries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Hinder Publishing, LLC, John Farrar Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Underachiever Music, Unichappell Music Inc., Hinder Music Co., Broadcast Music, Inc., NY and EMI Blackwood Music Inc.
Defendant: Imagination Industries, Inc. and Casey Rowe
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00128
Filed: April 6, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the entry of default against the defendants is vacated. The motion for default judgment 22 is denied. The motion to set aside judgment 26 is granted. The magistrate judge is ordered to progress this case. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF)
February 22, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PREGRESSION OF CASE: the 42 Motion to Extend is granted. All depositions, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by September 6, 2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2013 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Non-Jury Trial set to commence at the court's call during the week of 11/18/2013 in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB)
August 6, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 39 Motion for Summary Judgment. The court orders the defendants to pay to the plaintiffs: $30,000 in damages pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 504(c); and $476.80 in costs and $7,597.50 in attorney fees p ursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 505. The court also orders an award of interest pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961. The court further orders that defendants, their agents, servants, employees, and all persons acting under their permission and authorit y, be enjoined and restrained from infringing, in any manner, the copyrighted musical compositions licensed by BMI, pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 502. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Imagination Industries, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hinder Publishing, LLC
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Represented By: Robert A. Stark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Farrar Music
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Represented By: Robert A. Stark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Represented By: Robert A. Stark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Underachiever Music
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Represented By: Robert A. Stark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unichappell Music Inc.
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Represented By: Robert A. Stark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hinder Music Co.
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Represented By: Robert A. Stark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., NY
Represented By: Robert A. Stark
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Stark
Represented By: Jill R. Ackerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imagination Industries, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Rowe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]