Collum v. PayPal

Defendant: PayPal
Plaintiff: Brian T. Collum
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00153
Filed: May 3, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2012 13 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to reopen (Filing No. 10 ) and amended motion to reopen case (Filing No. 12 ), liberally construed as a motion for relief under Rule 60(b), are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
October 5, 2012 15 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Reopen Case (Filing No. 14 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
November 20, 2012 17 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing (Filing No. 16 ), liberally construed as a Motion for Relief Under Rule 60(b), is denied. The clerk of the court shall not accept further filings from plaintiff in this matter except for a notice of appeal. Any future case proposed to be filed in this Court by plaintiff shall be referred to the Supervising Pro Se Judge, Richard G. Kopf, or his successor, for review before filing, and the clerk of the court is directed not to file any such case until this review has been completed. The Supervising Pro Se Judge shall review any such tendered complaint and if it fails to comply with this Memorandum and Order and applicable law it shall be returned to plaintiff without filing. A rec ord of any such submission and return shall be maintained by the clerk in the CM/ECF system under the "PS" designation or as otherwise directed by the Supervising Pro Se Judge. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
May 23, 2012 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(JAB) Modified on 5/23/2012 to reflect plaintiff received copy by e-mail.(JAB)
July 3, 2012 6 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Collum shall have until July 23, 2012, to amend his complaint and clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against PayPal in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Collum fails to file an amended com plaint, Collum's claims against PayPal will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. In the event that Collum files an amended complaint, Collum shall restate the allegations of th e current complaint (Filing No. 1 ) and any new allegations. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in the abandonment of claims. Collum shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. (Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/23/2012: check for amended complaint) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)
August 14, 2012 8 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION - The Court previously granted Collum the opportunity to amend (see filing no. 6 ), his motion to amend is granted and the Court will consider Collum's amended allegations "as supplemental to, rather than as supersed ing" his original Complaint. Collum's amended allegations, even when considered as supplemental to his original complaint, are insufficient to nudge his "claims across the line from conceivable to plausible." Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party) (TEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Collum v. PayPal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian T. Collum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]