Standifer v. Broadmoon Development et al

Plaintiff: Steven Standifer
Defendant: Broadmoon Development and Stephanie Alba
Case Number: 8:2012cv00176
Filed: May 17, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - No later than September 21, 2012, Plaintiff must submit evidence or other documents showing the subject matter, and all issues raised, in the separate Nebraska state court matter(s) referenced by Plaintiff as "CI 125619" and "SC12 452." Such evidence may include the pleadings from the state-court matters. In the event that Plaintiff fails to submit adequate information showing the subject matter and issues raised in state court cases "CI 125619" and "SC12 452," this matter will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)
October 1, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's claim for discrimination based on familial status under the Fair Housing Act may proceed. To obtain service of process on Defendant, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons forms which the Clerk of the court will provide. The Clerk of the court shall send ONE (1) summons form and ONE (1) USM-285 form to Plaintiff together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk of the court. In the absence of the forms, service of process cannot occur. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the Clerk of the court will sign the summons form, to be forwarded with a copy of the Amended Complaint to the U.S. M arshal for service of process. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: "November 30, 2012: Check for completion of service of summons." Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy with forms mailed to pro se party as directed) (AOA)
November 13, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Request to Enter Default and Default Judgment (filing no. 16 ) is denied. Defendant's Objection (filing no. 19 ) to Plaintiff's request is granted. A separate progression order will be entered progressing this matter to final disposition. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
February 25, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANUM AND ORDER- Defendant's Motion for Protective Order and Stay of Discovery (Filing No. 27 ) is provisionally granted. Discovery is stayed pending resolution of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The court may lift the stay if, upon more careful review of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, it determines that discovery is necessary to the resolution of this matter. Plaintiffs Motion to Request Deadline Extensions (Filing No. 30 ) and Motion to Compel Disclosure (Filing No. 31 ) are denied as moot. Plaintiffs Motion in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order (Filing No. 37 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
June 4, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on the court's own motion. The final pretrial conference in this matter, currently scheduled for June 13, 2013, is cancelled. The conference may be rescheduled after the resolution of Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
May 24, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
June 11, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (case no. 8:12CV177, filing no. 7) is denied. No later than July 12, 2012, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in Case Number 8:12CV176. The amended complaint shall contain all of Plaintiff's claims, including those presented in Case Number 8:12CV177. Any claims not contained in the amended complaint will be deemed abandoned. All further pleadings shall be filed in Case Number 8:12CV176. In the event that Plaintiff f iles an amended complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order, the court will dismiss Case Number 8:12CV177. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order, Case Numbers 8:12CV176 and 8:12CV 177 may be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: July 12, 2012: deadline for Plaintiff to file amended complaint. All other pending Motions are denied without prejudice to reassertion after amendment. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
July 13, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Complaint 1 filed by Steven Standifer. This matter is before the court on its own motion. It is Ordered that: 1. Plaintiff's Complaint in Case Number 8:12CV177 (case no. 8:12CV177, filing no. 1 ) is dismisse d without prejudice in accordance with the court's June 11, 2012, Memorandum and Order. 2. All further pleadings shall be filed in Case Number 8:12CV176. 3. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standifer v. Broadmoon Development et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Standifer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadmoon Development
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Alba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]