Moore v. Madison County Jail

Defendant: Madison County Jail
Plaintiff: Jakota Moore
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00207
Filed: June 13, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2012 10 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 5 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $10.77 by August 6, 2012, unless an enlargement of time is granted in respon se to a written motion. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case will be dismissed. The clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at plaintiff's insti tution. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: August 6, 2012: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff's duplicative Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 7 ) is denied as moot. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/6/2012. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copies mailed as directed and to pro se party)(AOA)
September 11, 2012 21 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until October 12, 2012, to amend his complaint and clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against Madison County, in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, plaintiffs claims against Madison County will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. In the event that plaintiff files an amended complaint, plaintiff shall restate the allegations of the current Complaint (Filing No. 1), and any new allegations, including those contained in his supplements. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in their abandonment. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Check for amended complaint on October 12, 2012, and dismiss if none filed. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
October 15, 2012 25 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION on the court's own motion. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
November 20, 2013 28 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Copies and Status (FilingNo. 27 ) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth inthis Memorandum and Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet in this case. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party with docket sheet)(AOA)
June 26, 2012 4 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the complaint on or before July 23, 2012. Failure to comply with this memorandum and order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice . The clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: July 23, 2012: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy with form mailed as directed) (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Moore v. Madison County Jail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County Jail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jakota Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]