Bussing v. Legent Clearing, LLC et al

Defendant: Legent Clearing, LLC, Carlos P. Salas, COR Securities Holdings and Christopher L. Frankel
800) 871-5927 (fax: Julie A. Bussing
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00238
Filed: July 9, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2012 25 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the clerk is directed to provisionally restrict the plaintiff's amended complaint 19 filed by Julie A. Bussing. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (ADB)
October 18, 2012 41 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: --Granting 33 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend to correct the pleadings;--Denying as moot plaintiff's motions to restrict, filings 29 and 35 ; --Granting in part 39 , defendant's Motion to Restrict; a nd granting 20 Defendant's Motion to Restrict. The plaintiff may file a redacted version of the Second Amended Complaint no later than October 26, 2012. --Granting 37 , Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Revised Brief, (filing [38 ]). Defendants may file a reply to Plaintiffs Revised Brief in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss no later than October 26, 2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (copy mailed to plaintiff by CRZ's chambers)(Zwart, Cheryl)
October 30, 2012 47 Featured Case MEMORANDUN AND ORDER granting 43 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E- Government Act; granting 45 Motion to Allow Final Revised Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss & Motion to Restrict Access to All Pleadings. The plaintiff's Final Revised Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (filing no. 42) is deemed properly filed. The clerk of the court is directed to restrict Filing No. 42 in its entirety. In the event that the parties include the same, or similar, "non-public, sensitive information" in future filings, leave is given to the filing party, pursuant to NECivR 5.0.3, to file the document as restricted. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB, )
April 22, 2013 59 Featured Case ORDER granting 55 Motion for Leave to Submit Additional Briefing. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
May 20, 2013 60 Featured Case ORDER - the plaintiff's motions to compel, 48 , 49 , and 53 are denied without prejudice to re-filing, if appropriate, at a later time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
July 5, 2013 69 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 68 Defendant's Motion for Leave. All briefs currently of record are deemed timely and appropriately filed. The plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint, (Filing No. 63 ), is deemed fully submitted absent an order of the court requesting further briefing or oral argument. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
April 4, 2014 90 Featured Case ORDER denying Defendant's Motion to Strike 86 regarding Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Argument Related to Plaintiff's Objections 85 . The defendants have also requested that they be permitted to respond to the arguments raised i n the SEC's brief and to provide the Court with opposing briefs or filings from Liu or other similar cases. This request is reasonable and will be granted. The defendants may respond, in this limited fashion, on or before April 14, 2014. The pla intiff, in turn, requests that she be allowed to submit a reply brief. Filing 88 . The Court does not believe that any more briefing will be particularly helpful, and so that request is denied. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard.(JAB) Modified on 4/4/2014 to remove reference to pro se party. (JAB)
July 11, 2012 9 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 5 Motion to Seal. The clerk of the court is directed to provisionally restrict Filing No. 1 in its entirety. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bussing v. Legent Clearing, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legent Clearing, LLC
Represented By: Kasey M. Cappellano
Represented By: Gillian G. O'Hara
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos P. Salas
Represented By: Kasey M. Cappellano
Represented By: Gillian G. O'Hara
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COR Securities Holdings
Represented By: Gillian G. O'Hara
Represented By: Kasey M. Cappellano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher L. Frankel
Represented By: Kasey M. Cappellano
Represented By: Gillian G. O'Hara
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
800) 871-5927 (fax: Julie A. Bussing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]