Strickland v. Frudiker

Defendant: Michael T. Frudiker
Plaintiff: Raymond H. Strickland
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00288
Filed: August 10, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2012 16 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff shall have until November 28, 2012, to amend his Complaint and clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against Douglas County, Nebraska, in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Check for amended complaint on November 28, 2012, and dismiss if none filed; Motions to set aside filing fee 11 , 12 , 14 are granted; The initial partial filing fee and subsequent installments shall be collected and remitted, as funds exist, in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). Until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid, the prisoner shall be obligated to pay, and the agency having custody of the prisoner shall forward to the Clerk of the court, 20 percent of the preceding month's income in such months as the account exceeds $10.00; Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Extend time to pay filin g fee is denied as moot; plaintiff's Motions to Appoint Counsel 5 , 6 , 11 are denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (copy mailed to Douglas County Correctional Center, Attn: Steve Rangel or Peggy Wenninghoff, 710 South 17th Street, Omaha, NE 68102) (ADB)
March 12, 2013 20 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's claims against DCC and all the individual Defendants in their official capacities are dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiff's claims against "Mr. Foxall," "Captain John Hubbard,&quo t; "Lt. Morrison," "Sgt. McCleland," "Ofc DesAngelas," and "Ofc Russal" in their individual capacities are dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiff"s claims against Michael T. Frudiker and Robert Dellutri in their individual capacities may proceed; The Clerk of the court shall send two summons forms and two USM-285 forms to Plaintiff to complete and return to the Clerk who will forward to USM for service; The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: "July 9, 2013: Check for completion ofservice of summons." Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms as directed)(ADB)
June 5, 2013 30 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
June 21, 2013 33 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff shall have until July 19, 2013, to apprise the court of his current address, in the absence of which this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 19, 2013: deadline to inform court of new address. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
August 12, 2013 36 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on the court's own motion. This matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute this matter diligently and failure to comply with the courts orders; All pending motions are denied as moot; and A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
September 20, 2012 8 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Raymond H. Strickland shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $5.19 by 10/22/2012, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 10/22/2012: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and to institution)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Strickland v. Frudiker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Frudiker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond H. Strickland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]