United States of America v. Two Sums of United States Currency, $23,880.00 and $44,520.00

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Two Sums of United States Currency, $23,880.00 and $44,520.00
Case Number: 8:2012cv00311
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for final disposition. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (JAB)
November 18, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties' joint motion to continue, (Filing No. 34), is granted as follows: The non-jury trial of this case is set to commence before Cheryl R. Zwart, United States Magistrate Judge, in the Special Proceedings C ourtroom, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on February 3, 2014, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of one (1) trial day. A telephonic Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on January 21, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for the government shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL )
January 21, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall have until January 28, 2014 to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. The failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action and an order releasing the seized defendant property without further notice.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
January 21, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff shall have until January 28, 2014 to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. The failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action and an order releasing the seized defendant property without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL )
January 28, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the government has shown cause why this case should not be dismissed. Telephone Conference set for 2/3/2014 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. The case is removed from the court's trial docket pending further order.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CCB)
February 3, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Oral Motion to continue trial and cancel pretrial conference. Non-Jury Trial reset for 5/5/2014 at 09:00 AM Courtroom 1 (Special Proceedings), Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before Magis trate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. The parties proposed Pretrial Conference Order and Exhibit List(s) must be emailed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, in either Word Perfect or Word format, by 5:00 p.m. on April 22, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
April 25, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court SETTLEMENT ORDER. It is ordered that within 30 calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of court. Absent compliance with this order, this cas e (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. This case is removed from the court's current May 5, 2014 trial docket upon representation by the parties that the case has settled.(Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 5/27/2014.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
May 2, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 44 Stipulation for resolution of the case. On or before May 25, 2014, Claimants' counsel shall file a Receipt indicating receipt of the funds. Thereafter, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
May 23, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Attorney Lawrence Whelan has pending cases in this court and has not paid the 2013/2014 Attorney Assessment. Within 30 days from the date of this order, Mr. Whelan is directed to pay the $20.00 fee or show cause why he is unable to do so. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. ***Set/Reset All Deadlines: Show Cause Deadline set for 6/23/2014. (MTB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Two Sums of United States Currency, $23,880.00 and $44,520.00
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Sums of United States Currency, $23,880.00 and $44,520.00
Represented By: Lawrence G. Whelan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]