United States of America v. $59,800.00 in United States Currency

Defendant: $59,800.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2012cv00312
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for final disposition. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
February 28, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Joint Oral Motion. - - Non-Jury Trial continued to 6/12/2014 at 09:00 AM Courtroom 1 (Special Proceedings), Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.- - Pretrial Conference continued to May 27, 2014 at 10:00 a.m., and will be conducted by WebEx conferencing.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
May 27, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -1) The trial is continued pending further order of the court.2) The deadline for filing motions for summary judgment is September 2, 2014.3) If this case is not fully resolved by summary judgment, within ten ( 10) days after the summary judgment ruling, the parties shall contact the undersigned magistrate judge's chambers to re-schedule the pretrial conference and trial.4) To facilitate the court's ability to monitor the potential trial setting, the clerk shall set a case management deadline of October 14, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
February 24, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -1) Claimants' respective motions requesting transfer of venue to the Northern District of New York, (Filing Nos. 40 and 44 ), are denied.2) The nonjury trial of this case is set to commence before Cheryl R. Zwart , United States Magistrate Judge, in the Special Proceedings Courtroom, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on April 6, 2015, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration o f one trial day.3) The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on March 24, 2015 at 11:30 a.m., and will be conducted by telephone. Counsel for the plaintiff shall place or arrange the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $59,800.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $59,800.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]