Tama Plastic Industry v. Pritchett Twine & Net Wrap, LLC et al

Defendant: Bale Supply, LLC, James Brown, Zachary Brown, JJ Pritchett, Jerald Pritchett, Joseph Pritchett, Pritchett Twine & Net Wrap, LLC and Pritchett Twine, Net Wrap & Ag Sales
Counter Claimant: JJ Pritchett, Jerald Pritchett, Joseph Pritchett, Pritchett Twine & Net Wrap, LLC and Pritchett Twine, Net Wrap & Ag Sales
Parties Modified Per Order Of 7/9/12.: Joseph Jerald Pritchett
Counter Defendant: Tama Plastic Industry
Plaintiff: Tama Plastic Industry
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00324
Filed: September 11, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2012 189 Featured Case CLOSED TRANSFER - Tama's request that this Court give preclusive effect to its venue stipulation with the Pritchett Defendants is denied. [Dkt. 109 .] After considering the applicable factors and the parties' responses to the Court� 39;s proposed transfer, the Court concludes it is appropriate to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska. For the reasons detailed herein, the interest of justice factor is dispositive, and the addition al factors either do not weigh against transfer or further support it. Because the District of Nebraska is the superior forum for this litigation, the Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this action to that Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404 (a). T he Pritchett Defendants' Motion to Stay Litigation will remain pending for the transferee court to rule on, although it will be terminated as a pending motion on this Court's docket. Any previously ordered dates and deadlines are VACATED and any other pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. (SEE ORDER). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/11/2012. (JKS) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/11/2012.]
October 31, 2012 215 Featured Case ORDER granting 214 Motion to Extend. Plaintiff may file its response to the pending Motion for Protective Order by November 12, 2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
November 17, 2012 228 Featured Case ORDER: Defendants' reply in support of their Motion for Protective Order (Filing No. 211 ), and their response to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, (Filing No. 218 ), shall be filed on or before December 6, 2012.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
January 24, 2013 236 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding pending motions: 1) Defendants' motions to stay (Filings No. 69 & 216 ) are granted in part and denied in part. Further progression of this case is stayed except as stated in this order.2) Defendant' ;s motion for a protective order, (Filing No. 211 ) is denied.3) Plaintiff's motion to compel (Filing No. 218 ) is granted. To the extent Pritchett must produce names of its customers, that information shall be designated "Attorneys' Eyes Only" pursuant to the current Protective Order.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
March 14, 2013 242 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 237 Motion for Leave to withdraw Arthur S. Robinson, Jr. as counsel for Defendants/Counterclaimants Pritchett Twine & Net Wrap, LLC and Joseph Jerald Pritchett a/k/a Jerald Pritchett. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
August 2, 2013 244 Featured Case ORDER regarding Memorandum and Order 236 . The court stayed the case on January 24, 2013, to allow the United States Patent and Trademark Office to render an opinion in a reexamination proceeding. Counsel shall file a joint status report concern ing the status of this case on August 20, 2013, and every 90 days thereafter, such report to include the position(s) of counsel concerning whether the stay should continue in effect or whether the stay should be lifted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JAB)
October 15, 2013 262 Featured Case ORDER granting 261 Motion to Extend Deadlines in Case Management Plan. The deadlines set in the court's 9/18/13 Order 250 and the Revised Case Management Plan 249 referenced within, remain in effect with the exception of the amendments as set forth in this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
January 14, 2014 277 Featured Case ORDER granting 276 Motion to Extend. The parties shall have until 2/21/2014 to file Markman Reply Briefs. The Markman Hearing is rescheduled for 3/13/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
March 14, 2014 280 Featured Case ORDER that this matter is before the court following a telephone conference with counsel on March 14, 2014. The parties shall have until April 30, 2014, to file Markman Reply Briefs. The Markman Hearing is rescheduled for May 20, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. before the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon in Courtroom No. 3, Third Floor, Roman L. Hruska U.S. Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tama Plastic Industry v. Pritchett Twine & Net Wrap, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bale Supply, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brown
Represented By: Tony A. Gibbens
Represented By: Arthur S. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: David E. Novak
Represented By: William K. Doss
Represented By: Steven G. Cracraft
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Brown
Represented By: David E. Novak
Represented By: William K. Doss
Represented By: Steven G. Cracraft
Represented By: Arthur S. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Tony A. Gibbens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJ Pritchett
Represented By: Steven G. Cracraft
Represented By: William K. Doss
Represented By: David E. Novak
Represented By: Arthur S. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Tony A. Gibbens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerald Pritchett
Represented By: Steven G. Cracraft
Represented By: William K. Doss
Represented By: Kenan L. Farrell
Represented By: David E. Novak
Represented By: Arthur S. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Tony A. Gibbens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Pritchett
Represented By: Steven G. Cracraft
Represented By: William K. Doss
Represented By: Kenan L. Farrell
Represented By: David E. Novak
Represented By: Arthur S. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Tony A. Gibbens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pritchett Twine & Net Wrap, LLC
Represented By: Steven G. Cracraft
Represented By: William K. Doss
Represented By: Kenan L. Farrell
Represented By: Michael T. Gibbons
Represented By: David E. Novak
Represented By: Arthur S. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Tony A. Gibbens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pritchett Twine, Net Wrap & Ag Sales
Represented By: Steven G. Cracraft
Represented By: William K. Doss
Represented By: David E. Novak
Represented By: Arthur S. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Tony A. Gibbens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: JJ Pritchett
Represented By: Steven G. Cracraft
Represented By: William K. Doss
Represented By: David E. Novak
Represented By: Arthur S. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Tony A. Gibbens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Jerald Pritchett
Represented By: Steven G. Cracraft
Represented By: William K. Doss
Represented By: Kenan L. Farrell
Represented By: David E. Novak
Represented By: Arthur S. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Tony A. Gibbens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Joseph Pritchett
Represented By: Steven G. Cracraft
Represented By: William K. Doss
Represented By: Kenan L. Farrell
Represented By: David E. Novak
Represented By: Arthur S. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Tony A. Gibbens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Pritchett Twine & Net Wrap, LLC
Represented By: Steven G. Cracraft
Represented By: William K. Doss
Represented By: Kenan L. Farrell
Represented By: David E. Novak
Represented By: Arthur S. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Tony A. Gibbens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Pritchett Twine, Net Wrap & Ag Sales
Represented By: Steven G. Cracraft
Represented By: William K. Doss
Represented By: David E. Novak
Represented By: Arthur S. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Tony A. Gibbens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Parties modified per order of 7/9/12.: Joseph Jerald Pritchett
Represented By: Steven G. Cracraft
Represented By: William K. Doss
Represented By: Kenan L. Farrell
Represented By: Tony A. Gibbens
Represented By: David E. Novak
Represented By: Arthur S. Robinson, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Tama Plastic Industry
Represented By: Stephen E. Arthur
Represented By: Krista L. Kester
Represented By: Keir J. LoIacono
Represented By: Arnold I. Rady
Represented By: Edward H. Tricker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tama Plastic Industry
Represented By: Stephen E. Arthur
Represented By: Krista L. Kester
Represented By: Keir J. LoIacono
Represented By: Arnold I. Rady
Represented By: Edward H. Tricker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]