Egenberger Family Limited Partnership v. Walsworth Publishing Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Egenberger Family Limited Partnership
Defendant: Walsworth Publishing Company, Inc.
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00373
Filed: October 23, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2012 11 Featured Case SCHEDULING LETTER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
April 18, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Motion to Extend. Deposition deadline is September 13, 2013. Deadline for filing motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, and motions to exclude testimony on Daubert and related grounds is September 20, 2013. Deadline s for identifying expert witnesses and for complete expert disclosures are amended. The parties shall comply with all other deadlines recited in the Final Progression Order 14 dated January 7, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
July 11, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The Stipulated Dismissal, ECF No. 26 , is granted and this matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice and each party shall bear its own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Egenberger Family Limited Partnership v. Walsworth Publishing Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Egenberger Family Limited Partnership
Represented By: Troy F. Meyerson
Represented By: Patrick S. Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walsworth Publishing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan S. Hatch
Represented By: Jarrod D. Reece
Represented By: Daniel D. Crabtree
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]