Bluebird, Jr. v. The Village of Rushville, NE Volunteer Fire Department et al

Defendant: The Village of Rushville, NE Volunteer Fire Department, Sheridan County, Nebraska, Dwaine Sones, John Doe Members of the Rushville Volunteer Fire Department and Terry Robbins
Plaintiff: Bryan Bluebird, Jr.
Case Number: 8:2012cv00381
Filed: October 25, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2013 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
February 4, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1) The stipulation 28 of the parties is approved and adopted. 2) Diversity of citizenship and federal jurisdiction are present in this case. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
June 10, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 45 Motion to Amend Progression Deadlines. Depositions due 9/3/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2013 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Non-Jury Trial set for 10/15/2013 at 09:00 AM in North Platte Courtroom, Federal Bldg, US Post Office & Courthouse, 300 E 3rd St, North Platte, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
October 11, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Defendants' motion to continue is granted. The motion to seal Filing No. 71-1 is granted. Trial of this matter is rescheduled for: Monday, January 27, 2014, at 9 a.m. United States Post Office and Courthouse, 300 East Third Street, North Platte, Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
December 27, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting Stipulation for Dismissal 75 . This action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bluebird, Jr. v. The Village of Rushville, NE Volunteer Fire Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Village of Rushville, NE Volunteer Fire Department
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Nix
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheridan County, Nebraska
Represented By: Timothy R. Hook
Represented By: Robert S. Keith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwaine Sones
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Nix
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Members of the Rushville Volunteer Fire Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Robbins
Represented By: Robert S. Keith
Represented By: Timothy R. Hook
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Bluebird, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas M. White
Represented By: Amy S. Jorgensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]