Baumann et al v. Slezak et al

Defendant: Vladimir Zhukov, Swift-Truck Lines, Ltd., AKI Trucking, Inc., John Does 1 - 10, Long Haul Trucking, Inc., MTR Express, Inc., North Metro Truck Leasing, LLC and Josef Slezak
Plaintiff: Bradley B. Baumann, Nancy R. Baumann and Donna J. Costley
Case Number: 8:2012cv00383
Filed: October 29, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2014 147 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants Vladimir Zhukov, Swift-Truck Lines, Ltd., and MTR Express, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment (filing 113 ) is granted. All claims asserted against these Defendants by Plaintiffs are dismissed with prejudice. Defe ndant Long Haul Trucking, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (filing 117 ) is granted. All claims asserted against this Defendant by Plaintiffs are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint (filing 141 ) is denied as moot. Defendants Josef Slezak and AKI Trucking Inc.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (filing 120 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG )
March 26, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (filing 47 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
July 9, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Joint Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant North Metro TruckLeasing, LLC (filing 72 ) is adopted and approved. Defendant North Metro Truck Leasing, LLC is hereby dismissed with prejudice from this action. Plaintiffs' causes of action against the other Defendants remain intact and pending. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
July 31, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Expert Disclosures (filing 76 ) is granted. The parties shall identify expert witnesses by August 5, 2013. Plaintiffs' expert reports shall be served by August 21, 2013. Defen dants' expert reports shall be served by September 23, 2013. Plaintiffs rebuttal expert reports shall be served by October 8, 2013. Motions to exclude expert testimony on Daubert or related grounds shall be filed by October 21, 2013. Written discovery shall be completed by October 15, 2013. Depositions shall be completed by November 1, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
August 20, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Expert Disclosures (filing 79 ) is granted. Defendants' expert disclosures shall be served by or before October 28, 2013. Plaintiffs' rebuttal disclosures are due by November 11, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baumann et al v. Slezak et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vladimir Zhukov
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift-Truck Lines, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKI Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew F. Heffron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 - 10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Haul Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Michael B. Langford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTR Express, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Metro Truck Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Michael B. Langford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josef Slezak
Represented By: Matthew F. Heffron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley B. Baumann
Represented By: John P. Inserra
Represented By: James H. Chalat
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy R. Baumann
Represented By: John P. Inserra
Represented By: James H. Chalat
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna J. Costley
Represented By: John P. Inserra
Represented By: James H. Chalat
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]