Tyler v. EPA

Defendant: EPA
Plaintiff: Billy Tyler
Case Number: 8:2012cv00388
Filed: November 2, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
November 13, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
February 19, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff's grandchildren and all others similarly situated are dismissed from this matter. Plaintiff shall have until 3/19/13 to amend his Complaint. The Clerk is directed to set a Pro Se Case Management Deadline for 3/19/2013: Check for amended complaint. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
March 25, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute this matter diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
April 25, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (filing no. 8) is granted. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Court of Appeals with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyler v. EPA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Tyler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]