Martin v. Union Pacific Railroad Employees Health System, et al

Plaintiff: Erica Martin
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Employees Health System and United Healthcare
Case Number: 8:2012cv00397
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 14 ) is granted. The claims asserted against Defendant United Healthcare are dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)
April 9, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall produce the administrative record and relevant plan documents by May 13, 2013. Plaintiff shall review and analyze the administrative record and plan documents by June 12, 2013. The parties shall file their Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Report by June 26, 2013. If, however, the parties are unable to agree on a Rule 26(f) Report, they shall schedule a conference with the undersigned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
August 6, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend. The Court is unaware of what motions Plaintiff is referring to and the Court has no record of any July 31, 2013 motion deadlines. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JAB)
June 27, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 36 by August 6, 2014. Motions for summary judgment shall be filed by August 18, 2014. Pretrial disclosures shall be made by November 26, 2014. M otions in limine shall be filed by December 10, 2014. Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2014 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Trial shall commence, at the Courts call, during the week of January 20, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (KMG)
August 6, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 40 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's Motion to Compel (#36) on or before 10/6/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2015 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Non-Jury Trial set for 3/17/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
October 30, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The parties' Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice (Filing No. 43 ) is approved. The above-captioned action should be dismissed with prejudice. Each party will pay its own costs. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Union Pacific Railroad Employees Health System, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Martin
Represented By: Michael B. Kratville
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Employees Health System
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]