Knight et al v. Nash-Finch Company

Defendant: Nash-Finch Company
Plaintiff: Katherine E Meyer and Dean L Knight
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00404
Filed: November 20, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
October 28, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 30 Motion to Extend. Non-Jury Trial set for 6/2/2014 at 09:00 AM Courtroom 1 (Special Proceedings), Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plz, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2014 at 10:00 AM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. Telephone Conference set for 3/4/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
November 20, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading.On or before December 26, 2012, the defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Knight et al v. Nash-Finch Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash-Finch Company
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine E Meyer
Represented By: Edward F. Pohren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean L Knight
Represented By: Edward F. Pohren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]