Hodges v. Green et al

Defendant: Shelly Burghardt, Glenda Green and O.P.S.
Plaintiff: Valerie Hodges
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv00424
Filed: December 13, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2013 5 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
April 1, 2013 6 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff shall have 30 days to amend her Complaint to clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted, and to file a copy of her right-to-sue notice. The court reserves the right to conduct further review of Pla intiff's claims after Plaintiff addresses the matters set forth in this Memorandum and Order. The Clerk of court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline for 4/29/13: check for amended complaint and right-to-sue notice. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
August 14, 2013 8 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff's claims against the individual defendants, Glenda Green and Shelly Burghardt, are dismissed without prejudice. To obtain service of process on Defendant Omaha Public Schools, Plaintiff must complete and ret urn the summons form that the Clerk of the court will provide. The Clerk of the court shall send one summons form and one USM-285 form to Plaintiff, together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff shall complete the forms and return to the Clerk who shall forward to USM for service. The Clerk shall set a Case Management Deadline for 12/12/2013: check for completion of service of summons. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms)(ADB, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hodges v. Green et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Burghardt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.P.S.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Hodges
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]