Greis Trucking & Excavating, Inc. v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Greis Trucking & Excavating, Inc.
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv03160
Filed: August 2, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER denying 46 Motion for Protective Order; granting 47 Motion for Protective Order, as amended. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
April 7, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Joint Motion to Continue Trial and Discovery (Filing No. 53 ) is granted as set forth below. Except as may be otherwise agreed by the parties and counsel, this case is stayed to permit the parties to mediate this matter. The Order S etting Final Schedule for Progression of Case (Filing No. 52 ) is termed. The deadlines will be rescheduled, if necessary, following mediation. The parties shall confer with the court in a telephone conference on August 1, 2014, at 10:00 a.m., or file a report on the status of the mediation and whether the case has been settled, whichever is first. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the conference with the undersigned magistrate judge and participating counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (AOA)
July 29, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before 8/15/14, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation). Absent compliance with this order, this case may be dismissed without further notice. The telephone conference previously scheduled for 8/1/14 is cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Greis Trucking & Excavating, Inc. v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Kyle Wallor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greis Trucking & Excavating, Inc.
Represented By: Steven L. Theesfeld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]