Maher et al v. Creighton St. Joseph Regional Healthcare System, L.L.C. et al

Defendant: United States of America, Creighton St. Joseph Regional Healthcare System, L.L.C. and Andrew Myrtue
Plaintiff: Cindy Maher and Ron Maher
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00009
Filed: January 7, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2013 25 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL )
June 26, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER granting Motion to Strike Jury Demand 29 on Plaintiffs' claims for recovery under the Federal Tort Claims Act. The court may, however, try the plaintiffs' Federal Tort Claims Act claims with an advisory jury. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
October 3, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: On or before December 2, 2013, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to Chief District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, at smithcamp@ned.usco urts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. All other pending deadlines and/or hearings are cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
October 17, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS ORDERED: The parties' Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Creighton St. Joseph Regional Healthcare System, LLC, d/b/a Creighton University Medical Center (Filing No. 43 ) is approved. Plainti ffs' claims against Defendant Creighton St. Joseph Regional Healthcare System, LLC, d/b/a Creighton University Medical Center are dismissed with prejudice. The parties will pay their own attorney's fees and costs, complete record waived. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
February 3, 2014 50 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS ORDERED: The parties' Motion and Stipulation for Dismissal (Filing No. 49 ) is approved. The above-captioned case is dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs, and the complete record is waived. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Maher et al v. Creighton St. Joseph Regional Healthcare System, L.L.C. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Robert L. Homan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creighton St. Joseph Regional Healthcare System, L.L.C.
Represented By: Patrick G. Vipond
Represented By: Denise M. Destache
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Myrtue
Represented By: Robert L. Homan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Maher
Represented By: Andrew D. Sibbernsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Maher
Represented By: Andrew D. Sibbernsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]