Behrens v. Chase Home Finance

Plaintiff: Bryan Behrens
Defendant: Chase Home Finance
Case Number: 8:2013cv00017
Filed: January 11, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (filing no. 2 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $18.73 by April 25, 2013, unless an enlargement of time is granted in resp onse to a written motion. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case will be dismissed. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 25, 2013: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff's Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default (f iling no. 9 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. The court has carefully reviewed the record, and taken judicial notice of the numerous cases Plaintiff has filed in this court, and finds that this matter will not proceed until Plaintiff pays the initial partial filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed as directed and to pro se party) (AOA)
April 18, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal, construed as a Motion for Interlocutory Appeal (filing no. 19 ), is denied. The Clerk of the court shall not process the appeal to the Eighth Circuit. The Clerk of the court is directed to forward a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the parties and to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Plaintiff's Motion for Time and Request for Correction (filing no. 18 ) is granted in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Plaintif f shall have until May 27, 2013, to pay the initial partial filing fee in this matter. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this c ase using the following text: May 27, 2013: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed and pro se plaintiff)(AOA)
June 3, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs Complaint (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to comply with this court's orders. All pending motions are denied. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
July 9, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
July 25, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is permitted leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $18.73 by August 26, 2013, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. Afte r payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court. The Cl erk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiffs institution and to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed as directed and to pro se party) (AOA)
February 19, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until March 19, 2013, to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee or submit a certified trust account statement in support of his Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. In the event that Plaintiff fails to com ply with this Memorandum and Order, this matter will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: March 19, 2013: Check for institutional trust account statement. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Behrens v. Chase Home Finance
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Behrens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]