Applied Underwriters v. A & I Steel Fabricators, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Applied Underwriters
Defendant: Able Iron Works, Inc. and A & I Steel Fabricators, Inc.
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00025
Filed: January 16, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER granting Defendants' 23 Motion to Extend. The Defendants shall have until April 1, 2013, to file their reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss or, alternatively, to transfer venue. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
April 15, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Leave to file counter affidavit in regard to supplemental declaration of Eric N. Kibel in support of defendants of A&I Steel Fabricators nc.'s and Able Iron Works, Inc's motion to dismiss and/or change of venue. The defendant's shall have until April 30, 2013, to file its counter affidavit. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
April 23, 2013 31 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On or before May 14, 2013, plaintiff shall file a brief addressing whether California Insurance Company is a required party under the criteria of FRCP 19 and, if it is such a party, whether California Insurance Company's citizenship affects the Court's subject matter jurisdiction. On or before May 28, 2013, defendants shall file a responsive brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
September 9, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2013 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
October 15, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER approving and adopting the 44 Stipulation. Plaintiff shall have until October 25, 2013, to file its amended complaint. Defendants shall have until November 22, 2013, to respond thereto. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
January 28, 2014 53 Featured Case ORDER approving and adopting the 52 Stipulation of the parties to waive a jury trial and try the matter to the Court. This matter will be tried to the Court without a jury on: Monday, April 28, 2014, at 9 a.m. Courtoom No. 5, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
February 21, 2014 70 Featured Case ORDER denying 60 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
April 1, 2014 90 Featured Case ORDER granting the defendants' 86 Motion. The defendants shall have until April 7, 2014, to file their response to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
April 3, 2014 91 Featured Case ORDER: The pretrial conference and jury trial are continued pending further order of the court. The parties shall contact the undersigneds chambers within ten (10) days after the ruling on the motion for partial summary judgment to schedule a status conference addressing the further progression of this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
May 1, 2014 96 Featured Case ORDER denying 76 motion in limine to exclude expert testimony of Bernd G. Heinze. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Applied Underwriters v. A & I Steel Fabricators, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Applied Underwriters
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Silver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Able Iron Works, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr.
Represented By: Kristopher J. Covi
Represented By: Eric N. Kibel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & I Steel Fabricators, Inc.
Represented By: Eric N. Kibel
Represented By: Kristopher J. Covi
Represented By: Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]