Worden v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Lyle Dennis Worden
Case Number: 8:2013cv00028
Filed: January 17, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE granting 46 Motion for Leave to Endorse Additional Experts and granting 47 Motion to Continue Progression Deadlines. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/26/2014 at 10:00 AM in C hambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Jury Trial is set for 10/20/2014 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
April 30, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken for final disposition. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF)
September 9, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE granting 65 Joint Stipulation to Amend Deadlines. The Final Pretrial Conference with the undersigned magistrate judge is set for 11/4/14 at 10:00 a.m. in chambers, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Trial is set to commence 11/17/14 in Omaha, Nebraska, before the undersigned magistrate judge and a jury. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
November 12, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before 12/11/2014, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation). Absent compliance with this order, this case may be dismissed without further notice. The previously scheduled trial is cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. The defendant's Motion in Limine 79 is terminated as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
November 21, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the parties' 93 Stipulation for Dismissal. This action is dismissed, with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and complete record waived. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worden v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyle Dennis Worden
Represented By: James L. Cox, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]