Merkel et al v. Madsen et al

Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Plaintiff: Kami Merkel and Chris Merkel
Trustee: Patricia Fahey
Defendant: Lynn Madsen and Giant A & M Corporation
Case Number: 8:2013cv00044
Filed: February 5, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:1334ab Civil Proceeding (BK)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a Status Conference is set for 6/7/2013 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Mr. Lynn Madsen, pro se defendant, shall contact plaintiffs' counsel, with the telephone number where he can be reached so he may participate in the conference call. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se defendant at 318 N. Citrus Avenue, Vista, CA 92084. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copies mailed as directed) (ADB)
February 10, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the appearance of Copple, Rockey, McKeever & Schlecht P.C., L.L.O. as counsel for Defendant Giant A&M Corporation, Inc. and shall cease further notices to the firm in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
May 15, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 25 ) submitted by Plaintiff Chris Merkel is granted, in part, as follows: Judgment will be entered in favor of Plaintiff Chris Merkel and against Defendant Giant A&M, Inc., o n Chris Merkel's claim for breach of contract, in the sum of $340,000.00; the Motion is otherwise denied; and In the absence of a showing by Plaintiffs on or before May 30, 2014, why the remainder of their claims should not be dismissed, a separate Judgment consistent with this Memorandum and Order will be entered, and the remaining claims dismissed, without prejudice. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
February 26, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting 1 The Report and Recommendation. The parties' adversary proceeding shall progress in this Court. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
April 16, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Attorney Kyle Dahl's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merkel et al v. Madsen et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk - Omaha
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kami Merkel
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Merkel
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Patricia Fahey
Represented By: Jerry L. Jensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Madsen
Represented By: Kyle C. Dahl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giant A & M Corporation
Represented By: Howard T. Duncan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]