Hawkins Construction Company v. Peterson Contractors, Inc. et al

Defendant: Geopier Foundation Company, Axis Surplus Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Ground Improvement Engineering, L.L.C. and Peterson Contractors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hawkins Construction Company
Case Number: 8:2013cv00046
Filed: February 8, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
September 19, 2014 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER upon notice of settlement given to the magistrate judge on September 19, 2014. On or before November 3, 2014, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the H onorable Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The previously scheduled case progression deadlines, pretrial conference, and trial are cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 11/3/2014.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
May 22, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The parties' duty to meet, confer, and file a joint planning report to the court in accordance with the requirement of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) is stayed pending resolution of the defendants motions to dismiss. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
September 4, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Zurich American Insurance's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim, Filing No. 45 , is denied. Axis Insurance Company's motion to dismiss, Filing No. 47 , is denied. Ground Improvement Engineering's motion to dismiss, Filing No. 55 , is granted in part. Geopier Foundation Company's motion to dismiss, Filing No. 62 , is granted in part. Hawkins Construction Company's motion to strike the reply brief, Filing No. 72 , is denied. The plaintiff is granted 30 days to file an amended complaint relating to its Eleventh Claim for Relief against GIE and Geopier. If an amended complaint is not timely filed, the plaintiffs Eleventh Claim for Relief is dismissed. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins Construction Company v. Peterson Contractors, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geopier Foundation Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Angela Probasco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ground Improvement Engineering, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterson Contractors, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawkins Construction Company
Represented By: Todd W. Weidemann
Represented By: Edward H. Tricker
Represented By: Monica L. Freeman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]