Cleveland et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al

Defendant: W-L Enterprises, LLC, BSNF Railway Company, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Richard Lapp and Gerald Shetler
Cross Defendant: Gerald Shetler, Richard Lapp and W-L Enterprises, LLC
Cross Claimant: BSNF Railway Company and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Jean Cleveland and Willie Cleveland
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00049
Filed: February 12, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the stipulation is approved and adopted. Jeanelle R. Lust and the law firm of Knudsen, Berkheimer, Richardson & Endacott, LLP, are substituted as attorneys of record for W-L Enterprises, L.L.C., and Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP, are deemed withdrawn as counsel and shall be removed from the CM/ECF notification list. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
June 26, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion 37 is granted. Jeanelle R. Lust and the law firm of Knudsen, Berkheimer, Richardson & Endacott, LLP, are deemed withdrawn as counsel for W-L Enterprises, L.L.C. and shall be removed from the CM/ECF notification list. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
July 1, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint report on or before July 25, 2013, as to the status of the settlement, if there is one. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
September 20, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the stipulation 41 of the parties is approved and adopted. This action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cleveland et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W-L Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Jeanelle R. Lust
Represented By: Steven J. Auletta
Represented By: Adonaid C. Medina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSNF Railway Company
Represented By: Thomas C. Sattler
Represented By: Andrew P. Keaveney
Represented By: Nichole S. Bogen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Nichole S. Bogen
Represented By: Andrew P. Keaveney
Represented By: Thomas C. Sattler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lapp
Represented By: Robert P. Meyerson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Shetler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Gerald Shetler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Richard Lapp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: W-L Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Jeanelle R. Lust
Represented By: Steven J. Auletta
Represented By: Adonaid C. Medina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: BSNF Railway Company
Represented By: Thomas C. Sattler
Represented By: Andrew P. Keaveney
Represented By: Nichole S. Bogen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Andrew P. Keaveney
Represented By: Nichole S. Bogen
Represented By: Thomas C. Sattler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Cleveland
Represented By: Mark G. Sokoloff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Cleveland
Represented By: Mark G. Sokoloff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]