Verby v. PayPal, Inc. et al

Defendant: Heather Johnson, PayPal, Inc., Justin Sebeck and Jody Willey
Plaintiff: Austi M Verby
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00051
Filed: February 13, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
October 14, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Continue. The written and deposition discovery deadlines are extended to November 23, 2013. In all other respects, the progression order remains the same. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
December 2, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to compel, (Filing No. 37 ), is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
December 2, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 37 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's discovery requests are not tailored to obtain only information relevant or capable of leading to the discovery of information relevant to this case. Plaintiff's sweeping reque sts for information are overly broad and unduly burdensome. As such, the defendants' objections to the plaintiff's discovery requests identified in the motion to compel will be sustained. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
March 17, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - On the court's own motion,1) The pretrial conference and trial are continued pending a ruling on the defendants' motion for summary judgment.2) If summary judgment is not granted in favor of the defendants, within ten (10) days after the summary judgment ruling is entered, the parties shall contact my chambers and set a conference to reschedule the pretrial conference and trial.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
April 29, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendants' motion for summary judgment (filing 45 ) is granted. The plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Verby v. PayPal, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Johnson
Represented By: Heidi A. Guttau-Fox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi A. Guttau-Fox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Sebeck
Represented By: Heidi A. Guttau-Fox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Willey
Represented By: Heidi A. Guttau-Fox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austi M Verby
Represented By: Mary K. Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]