Shere v. City of Bellevue, Nebraska et al

Defendant: City of Bellevue Building Permits Department, City of Bellevue, Nebraska and City of Bellevue Fire and Rescue Department
Plaintiff: Jeremy Shere
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv00053
Filed: February 14, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT - This matter is before the court on the court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a), which states: "Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify himself in any proceeding in which his impartiality might reasonably be questioned." Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse himself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a). Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (GJG)
January 2, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER:--Granting in part and denying in part 25 pliantiff's motion to compel and 31 defendants' objection as stated in filing 37 .--The trial and pretrial conference are continued pending further order of the cou rt. --The progression schedule is amended as stated in the order.--A Status Conference is set for 7/29/2014 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
June 3, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motion to substitute Angela F. Schmit as counsel of record, and to permit Aimee C. Bataillon to withdraw as counsel of record on behalf of the defendants, (filing no. 40 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
July 29, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiff shall review and sign his deposition on or before July 31, 2014, after which the deposition shall be immediately provided to defense counsel. The summary judgment deadline is extended to August 4, 2014. Th e court finds the plaintiff adequately and timely disclosed Dr. Pamela M. Santamaria both as a lay and as a non-retained expert witness, and she is permitted to testify accordingly. As such, the defendants' motion to quash, (Filing No. 44 ), is denied. The plaintiff's resistance to the motion to quash, (Filing No. 46 ), remains pending as to the issue of attorney fees and costs. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on Novem ber 18, 2014 at 11:00 a.m., and will be conducted by WebEx Conferencing. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. The parties proposed Pretrial Conference Orde r and Exhibit List(s) must be emailed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, in either Word Perfect or Word format, by 5:00 p.m. on November 17, 2014. The jury trial of this case is set to commence before John M. Gerrard, United States District Judge, i n the Special Proceedings Courtroom, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on December 1, 2014, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of five (5) trial days. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one. Jury selection will be held at the commencement of trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Shere v. City of Bellevue, Nebraska et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bellevue Building Permits Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bellevue, Nebraska
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bellevue Fire and Rescue Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Shere
Represented By: Jerry W. Katskee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]